Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/13/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/13/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/13/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/13/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 09/13/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/13/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/13/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/13/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 09/13/1993
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 09/13/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/13/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/13/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/03/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/03/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/03/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/03/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 11/03/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/17/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 11/17/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 11/17/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 11/17/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 11/17/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 11/17/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/17/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/17/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/17/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 11/17/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/17/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/22/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 11/22/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/22/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/22/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/22/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/22/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 03/22/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/22/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/22/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/22/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/12/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/12/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/12/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 05/12/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/12/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 08/02/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/02/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 08/02/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/08/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/08/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/08/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 08/08/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/08/1994