Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/09/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/09/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/09/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/09/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/09/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/09/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/09/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 09/09/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 09/09/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/09/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/09/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/09/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/09/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/13/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 09/13/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/13/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/13/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/21/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/21/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 09/21/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 09/21/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/21/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/21/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/21/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/21/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/21/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/22/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 09/22/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/23/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 09/23/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 09/23/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/23/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/28/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 09/28/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/28/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/1993
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/29/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/29/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/29/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 09/29/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/13/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/13/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 10/13/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 10/20/1993
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 10/20/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 11/17/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/17/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/17/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/17/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/17/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/22/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/22/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/25/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 02/02/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/11/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/17/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/13/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/12/1994