Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1]* 09/21/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/21/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/22/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 09/22/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/28/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/28/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/28/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/28/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/28/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/30/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/30/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 09/30/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/07/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 10/13/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/27/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/02/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 11/02/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/01/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/01/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/02/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/03/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/07/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/07/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 02/07/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/08/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/08/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/09/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/10/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 02/11/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/22/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/22/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/01/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/09/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/10/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/10/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/10/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/16/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/16/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/22/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/23/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/26/1994