Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/29/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 09/29/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 09/29/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 09/29/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/29/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/29/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/06/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/06/1993
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/1993
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/06/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/06/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 10/06/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/06/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 10/14/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 10/14/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 10/14/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 10/14/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/14/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/14/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 10/14/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/14/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 10/14/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/14/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 11/04/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/04/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/04/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/04/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/04/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/23/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 11/23/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/23/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/23/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/11/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 05/11/1994