Text: H.Con.Res.166 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/14/1993)

 
[Congressional Bills 103th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Con. Res. 166 Introduced in House (IH)]

103d CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. CON. RES. 166

     Expressing the sense of the Congress with respect to Taiwan's 
membership in the United Nations and other international organizations.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                            October 14, 1993

 Mr. Torricelli (for himself, Mr. Deutsch, Mr. Dornan, Mr. Gejdenson, 
 and Mr. Tauzin) submitted the following concurrent resolution; which 
            was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                         CONCURRENT RESOLUTION


 
     Expressing the sense of the Congress with respect to Taiwan's 
membership in the United Nations and other international organizations.

Whereas the Republic of China was one of the founding members of the United 
        Nations in 1945;
Whereas at the end of the civil war in China in 1949 the Kuomindang nationalists 
        were defeated and moved their Republic of China government to the island 
        of Taiwan;
Whereas the governments in both Beijing and Taipei claim that they represent all 
        of China, including Taiwan;
Whereas on December 15, 1978, the United States and the People's Republic of 
        China released a joint communique that announced a switch in United 
        States diplomatic recognition from Taipei to Beijing;
Whereas that joint communique also stated that ``the United States will maintain 
        cultural, commercial, and other unofficial relations with the people of 
        Taiwan'';
Whereas on December 15, 1978, in a unilateral statement released concurrently 
        with that joint communique, the United States stated that it ``continues 
        to have an interest in the peaceful resolution of the Taiwan issue'';
Whereas on April 10, 1979, President Carter signed into law the Taiwan Relations 
        Act (Public Law 96-8), effective as of January 1, 1979, which created a 
        domestic legal authority for the conduct of unofficial relations with 
        Taiwan;
Whereas since January 1, 1979, the United States, in accordance with the Taiwan 
        Relations Act, has continued the sale of selected defense articles and 
        defense services to Taiwan;
Whereas in spite of its economic achievements and significant role in the world 
        economy and in world affairs, Taiwan does not have representation in the 
        United Nations or in other international organizations;
Whereas the people of Taiwan have, through their elected legislators, expressed 
        a strong desire to join the United Nations and other international 
        organizations; and
Whereas the participation of the people on Taiwan in the United Nations and in 
        other international organizations would further enhance the peace, 
        security, and stability in the Pacific and is in the best interests of 
        the United States: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), 
That it is the sense of the Congress that the 21,000,000 people on 
Taiwan should be represented in the United Nations and in other 
international organizations.

                                 <all>