Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/21/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/24/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/29/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/29/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/02/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/20/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 04/20/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/20/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/20/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/20/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/20/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/20/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 04/20/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/20/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/20/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/20/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/20/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/20/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/20/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/20/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/20/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/20/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/20/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/20/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/20/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/20/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/20/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/20/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/20/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/20/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/20/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/20/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/20/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/20/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/20/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 04/20/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/20/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/20/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 04/20/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/20/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/20/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/20/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/20/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 04/20/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/20/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/20/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/20/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/20/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/23/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/23/1994
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/23/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 05/23/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/10/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/10/1994
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 06/10/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 06/10/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/10/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/10/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/10/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/10/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/10/1994
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 06/10/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/10/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/10/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/10/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/10/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 06/10/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/10/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/10/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/10/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/10/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/19/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/19/1994