There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress that a dramatic new direction in Federal Government energy research, development, demonstration and commercialization funding priorities should be adopted to improve environmental protection, create new jobs, enhance United States competitiveness, and reduce the trade deficit.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/22/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/09/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/29/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space and Technology
11/23/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E3023)
Action By: House of Representatives
11/22/1993Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/22/1993Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/22/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (128)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/01/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/01/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/01/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/01/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/01/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/01/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/01/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/01/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 02/01/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 03/08/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 03/08/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/1994
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/08/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/08/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/08/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/08/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/08/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/08/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/08/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/08/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/08/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/08/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/08/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 04/12/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/12/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 04/12/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/12/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/12/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/12/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/12/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/12/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/12/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/12/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/12/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/09/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 05/09/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/09/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/09/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/09/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/09/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/09/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/09/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/09/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/09/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/09/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/09/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/09/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/09/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 05/09/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/09/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/09/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/23/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/23/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 05/23/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/23/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 09/19/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 09/19/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/19/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/07/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/07/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/07/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/07/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/07/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce11/22/1993 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power02/09/1994 Referred to
House Science, Space and Technology11/22/1993 Referred to
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Energy11/29/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.188.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.188. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/22/1993)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that the national policy of the United States should be to: (1) increase energy efficiency, as specified; (2) increase renewable energy technologies to 20 percent of the overall national energy mix by 2010; and (3) achieve these goals by adopting a specified national strategy.