Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 11/22/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/01/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/01/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/01/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 02/01/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/01/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/01/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 02/01/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/01/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/01/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 02/01/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 03/08/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 03/08/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/1994
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/08/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/08/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 03/08/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/08/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/08/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/08/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/08/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/08/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/08/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 03/08/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 03/08/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/08/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/08/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/08/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/08/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/08/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/12/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 04/12/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/12/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 04/12/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/12/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/12/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/12/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/12/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/12/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/12/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/12/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/12/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/12/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/12/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/12/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/09/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 05/09/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/09/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/09/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 05/09/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/09/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/09/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/09/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/09/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/09/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/09/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/09/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/09/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/09/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 05/09/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 05/09/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/09/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/23/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/23/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 05/23/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/23/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/23/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 09/19/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 09/19/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/19/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/19/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/07/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/07/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/07/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/07/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/07/1994