Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 02/02/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 02/02/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5]* 02/02/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/02/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 02/02/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 02/09/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/09/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 02/09/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 02/09/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/02/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/02/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 03/02/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/02/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/02/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/24/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/24/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/24/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/03/1994