Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 02/07/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/07/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 02/07/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 02/07/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8]* 02/07/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 02/07/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/09/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/09/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/22/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 02/22/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 02/22/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/22/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/22/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 02/22/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 02/22/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/22/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 02/22/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/24/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/02/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/02/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/02/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/02/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/02/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/10/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/18/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/18/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/21/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/23/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/14/1994
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/20/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/26/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 04/26/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/17/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 06/17/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/21/1994