Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/24/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/26/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/26/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/26/1994
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/26/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/26/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/26/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/26/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/26/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/26/1994
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/26/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/26/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/26/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/26/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 05/26/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/26/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/26/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/26/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/26/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/26/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/26/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/26/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/26/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 05/26/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/26/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/26/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 05/26/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 05/26/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/26/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/26/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/26/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 05/26/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/26/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/26/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/26/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/16/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/16/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/16/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/16/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/16/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/16/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/16/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 06/16/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/16/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/16/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/16/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/16/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/16/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/16/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 06/16/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/16/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/16/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/16/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/16/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/16/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 06/16/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/16/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/16/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/16/1994
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19] 06/16/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/16/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/16/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 06/28/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/28/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 06/28/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 06/28/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/28/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/28/1994
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 06/28/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/28/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/28/1994
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/28/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/28/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/28/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/27/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/27/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/27/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/27/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/27/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/27/1994
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/27/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/27/1994
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/27/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/27/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 07/27/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/27/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/27/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 07/27/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/27/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 07/27/1994
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/27/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 07/27/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/27/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/27/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/27/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/27/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/27/1994
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/27/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 08/16/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/16/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 08/16/1994
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/16/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 08/16/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 08/16/1994
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 08/16/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/16/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 08/16/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/06/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/06/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/06/1994