Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 04/26/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 04/26/1994
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 04/26/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/26/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/26/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/26/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/08/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/08/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/08/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/08/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/08/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/08/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/21/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/21/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/21/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/21/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/28/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/28/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/30/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/30/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/13/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/13/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/13/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 07/19/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 07/19/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 07/22/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/26/1994
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/26/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/26/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/02/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/02/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/02/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 08/02/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/09/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 08/09/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/26/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 08/26/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 09/13/1994
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/13/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 09/22/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/22/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/07/1994