Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/11/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/08/1994
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/08/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 06/08/1994
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 06/08/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/08/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/08/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/08/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/08/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/22/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/22/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/22/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/22/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 06/22/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/22/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/22/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/22/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/22/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/22/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/22/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/22/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/22/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/22/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 06/29/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/29/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/29/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/29/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/29/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 06/29/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/12/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/12/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/12/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/12/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/12/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/19/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/19/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/19/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/19/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/19/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/19/1994
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/19/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 07/19/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/19/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/27/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/27/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/27/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/27/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/27/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 07/27/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 07/27/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 07/27/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 08/11/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 08/11/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 08/11/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 08/11/1994
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/11/1994
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 08/11/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 08/11/1994
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 08/11/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 08/11/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 08/21/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/21/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 08/21/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/21/1994
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/19/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/19/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 09/19/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/19/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/06/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 10/06/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/06/1994