There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Condemning the death sentence issued against British author Salman Rushdie by the Ayatollah Ruhollah Khomeini in Iran and calling for its immediate repudiation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/12/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/23/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations and Human Rights.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/23/1994Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/12/1994Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E913)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/12/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/12/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/29/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/29/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/29/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/29/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 07/29/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/29/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/29/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 07/29/1994
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/29/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/29/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/29/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/29/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/29/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/29/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/29/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/29/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/29/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/29/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/29/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/29/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 07/29/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/12/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/12/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/12/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/12/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 10/04/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/04/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 10/04/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 10/04/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/04/1994
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 10/04/1994
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/04/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/04/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/04/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/12/1994 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East05/23/1994 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations, and Human Rights05/23/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.249.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.249. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/12/1994)

Condemns the death sentence issued against Salman Rushdie. Calls for the immediate withdrawal of such sentence and any associated reward.

Calls upon the President to: (1) request that the United Nations Security Council condemn Iran for issuing the edict against Rushdie; (2) call upon the Government of Iran to respect international principles of human rights and lift such sentence; and (3) inform such Government that the House of Representatives has adopted this resolution, that the Iranian Government will be held liable in case an attempt is made on Rushdie's life, and that such Government should attempt to prevent the spread of propaganda promoting Rushdie's assassination.

Commends those people of all nations who have firmly stood for freedom of expression despite threats and intimidation.

Reaffirms: (1) the commitment of the Congress to the promotion and protection of the right of freedom of expression; and (2) congressional support for basic human rights in the world community.