Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/20/1994
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/20/1994
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/20/1994
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/20/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/20/1994
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/20/1994
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/20/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 07/20/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/20/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/20/1994
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 07/20/1994
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 08/08/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/08/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/08/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 08/08/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/08/1994
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 08/08/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/12/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 09/12/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/12/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/12/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/12/1994
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 09/12/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/26/1994
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/26/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/26/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/26/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/26/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 09/26/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/03/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/05/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/05/1994