Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 07/21/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/21/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 07/21/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 07/21/1994
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/21/1994
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/27/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/27/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/27/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 07/27/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/27/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/27/1994
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/27/1994
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/27/1994
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 07/27/1994
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/27/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/27/1994
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 07/27/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/27/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 07/27/1994
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/29/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/29/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 07/29/1994
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/29/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 07/29/1994
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/29/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/29/1994
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 08/09/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 08/09/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 08/09/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 08/09/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 08/09/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 08/09/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/12/1994