There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress with respect to the announcement of the Japanese Food Agency that it does not intend to fulfill its commitment to purchase 75,000 metric tons of United States rice.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/27/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/27/1994Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/27/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1571)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/27/1994Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 08/04/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 08/04/1994
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 08/05/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 08/05/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 08/05/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 08/05/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/12/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 08/12/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/19/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 08/19/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 08/19/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/19/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 08/19/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/19/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/19/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 08/19/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/19/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 08/19/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/19/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 08/19/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/19/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/19/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/19/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 08/19/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 08/19/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 08/19/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 08/19/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/19/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/27/1994 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.274. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/27/1994)

Expresses the sense of the Congress disapproving of the Japanese Food Agency's decision not to fulfill its commitment to purchase 75,000 metric tons of U.S. rice.