Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/27/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 08/04/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 08/04/1994
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 08/05/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 08/05/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 08/05/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 08/05/1994
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/12/1994
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 08/12/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/19/1994
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 08/19/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 08/19/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/19/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/19/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 08/19/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/19/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/19/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 08/19/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 08/19/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 08/19/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/19/1994
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 08/19/1994
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/19/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/19/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/19/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 08/19/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 08/19/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 08/19/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 08/19/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 08/19/1994