Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 08/03/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 08/03/1994
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 08/05/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 08/05/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/05/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/05/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 08/05/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 08/05/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/05/1994
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/05/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 08/05/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 08/05/1994
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/05/1994
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 08/05/1994
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 08/05/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 08/05/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/12/1994
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 08/12/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/12/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/12/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/12/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 08/12/1994
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/12/1994
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/12/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 08/12/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/12/1994
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 08/12/1994
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 08/12/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/12/1994
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 08/12/1994
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 08/12/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 08/12/1994
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 08/12/1994
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/12/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 08/12/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 08/12/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 08/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/12/1994
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/12/1994
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/12/1994
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 09/12/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 09/12/1994
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/12/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/12/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/12/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 09/12/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/12/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/12/1994
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 09/12/1994
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 09/12/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/12/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/12/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 09/12/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/12/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/12/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/12/1994
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/12/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/12/1994
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/12/1994
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/12/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/12/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 09/12/1994
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/16/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 09/16/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/16/1994
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/16/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/16/1994
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 09/16/1994
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/16/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/16/1994
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/16/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 09/16/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/16/1994
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/16/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 09/16/1994
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/16/1994
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/16/1994
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/16/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 09/16/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 09/16/1994
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/16/1994
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/16/1994
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/16/1994
Rep. Schenk, Lynn [D-CA-49] 09/16/1994
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 09/16/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 09/16/1994
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/16/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 09/16/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/16/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/16/1994
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 09/19/1994
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 09/19/1994
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/19/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/19/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/19/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/07/1994