Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-19]* 08/11/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/12/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/12/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/12/1994
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/12/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 09/12/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/12/1994
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/12/1994
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/12/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/12/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/13/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/13/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/13/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/20/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/20/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 09/20/1994
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/20/1994
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/20/1994
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 09/20/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/20/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/20/1994
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 09/20/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 09/20/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/20/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/21/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/21/1994
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/21/1994
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/22/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 09/22/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 09/22/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/29/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/29/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/29/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/29/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 09/29/1994
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/30/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 09/30/1994
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/05/1994