There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Directing the Secretary of the Senate to make technical corrections in the enrollment of S. 2182.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
09/23/1994Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR H9589)
09/21/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
08/17/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
08/17/1994Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
09/23/1994-12:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/1994-12:14pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H9589)
09/23/1994-12:14pmHouseMr. Montgomery asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment.
09/22/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/21/1994SenateResolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/21/1994SenateS.Amdt.2586 Amendment SP 2586 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
09/21/1994SenateAmendment SP 2586 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
09/21/1994SenateS.Amdt.2586 Proposed by Senator Conrad for Senator Nunn. To add corrections.
09/21/1994SenateAmendment SP 2586 proposed by Senator Conrad for Senator Nunn.
09/21/1994SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S13087)
08/17/1994SenateReceived in the Senate.
08/17/1994-5:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/17/1994-5:56pmHouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection.
08/17/1994-5:54pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8563-8564)
08/17/1994-5:54pmHouseMr. Dellums asked unanimous consent to consider as introduced.
08/17/1994HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (0)

As of 01/24/2020 text has not been received for H.Con.Res.285 - Directing the Secretary of the Senate to make technical corrections in the enrollment of S. 2182.

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.285. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/21/1994)

Directs the Secretary of the Senate to make technical corrections in the enrollment of S. 2182 (defense funding for FY 1995).