There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Calling for the United States to propose and seek an international embargo against the totalitarian government of Cuba.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/16/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
04/22/1993Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs
04/22/1993Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs
03/22/1993Executive Comment Requested from State.
03/09/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations and Human Rights.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/09/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Policy, Trade and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/09/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/16/1993Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E327)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/16/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/02/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 03/02/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/02/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/02/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/02/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 03/02/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/02/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/02/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/02/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/02/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/02/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/02/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/02/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/02/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 03/02/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 03/02/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 03/02/1993
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/02/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/02/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/02/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/02/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/02/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/02/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 03/02/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/02/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/02/1993
Rep. Hoke, Martin R. [R-OH-10] 03/02/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 03/02/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/02/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/11/1993
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/11/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/11/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/11/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/25/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 03/25/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/25/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/05/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/05/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/05/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 04/05/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 04/05/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/21/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/21/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/21/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/16/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Policy, Trade, and Environment03/09/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations, and Human Rights03/09/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs03/09/1993 Referred to
04/22/1993 Markup by
04/22/1993 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.38.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.38. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/1993)

Expresses the sense of the Congress that: (1) the United States considers the acts of the Castro government, including its violations of human rights, a threat to international peace; and (2) the President should instruct U.S. representatives to the United Nations Security council to seek an international embargo against the totalitarian government of Cuba.