Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 03/23/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 03/23/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 03/23/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/05/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/05/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/05/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/05/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/05/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/05/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/05/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 04/05/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/05/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/05/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/05/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/05/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 04/05/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/05/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 04/05/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/05/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/05/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 04/05/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/05/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/05/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 04/05/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/05/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/05/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/05/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/05/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/05/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 04/05/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 04/05/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/28/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/28/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 04/28/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/18/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 05/18/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/18/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/18/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 05/26/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/26/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/16/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/16/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/16/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 06/29/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/05/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 08/05/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 07/14/1994
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/14/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 07/14/1994
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 07/14/1994
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/10/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 08/10/1994