Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/07/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/07/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 04/07/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 04/07/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/07/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 04/07/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/07/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 04/07/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/20/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/20/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/26/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/26/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/26/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/26/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/28/1993
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/28/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/28/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/28/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/28/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 04/28/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/04/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/04/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/04/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/04/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/04/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 05/04/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/05/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/05/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 05/11/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/11/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/11/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/11/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/11/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/11/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/11/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/11/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/20/1993
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/20/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/24/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/24/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/08/1993
Rep. Shepherd, Karen [D-UT-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/08/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 06/15/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 06/15/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/15/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/29/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/23/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/03/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/10/1993