Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/11/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/11/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 05/11/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/11/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/11/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/11/1993
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/11/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/11/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/20/1993
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/20/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/08/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/08/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/08/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 06/10/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/27/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/06/1993