Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/16/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/16/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 02/24/1993
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/24/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 02/24/1993
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 02/24/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/24/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/24/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 02/24/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/24/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/24/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/24/1993
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/24/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/24/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/24/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 02/24/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/24/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 03/10/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/10/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/10/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/10/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/10/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/24/1993
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/24/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/24/1993
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 03/24/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/24/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 03/24/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 03/24/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 03/24/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/24/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/27/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 04/27/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/27/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/27/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/27/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/27/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/27/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/27/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/27/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/27/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/27/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/27/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/27/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/27/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/27/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/27/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 04/27/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/27/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/27/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/27/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/27/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/27/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/27/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/27/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/27/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 04/27/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/27/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/27/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/27/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/27/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 04/27/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/05/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/05/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/05/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/05/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/05/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/05/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/05/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/05/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/05/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/05/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/05/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/05/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/05/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/05/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/05/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/05/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/05/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/05/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 05/05/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/11/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/11/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/11/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/11/1993
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 05/11/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/13/1993