Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/10/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/14/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/21/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/22/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/23/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/28/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/29/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 09/29/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/29/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/30/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/06/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 10/07/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 10/14/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 10/15/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/19/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/19/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 10/20/1993
Rep. Deal, Nathan [D-GA-9] 10/27/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/27/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/28/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 10/28/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/28/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 11/03/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 11/03/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/03/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/03/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/03/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 11/03/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/03/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 11/03/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 11/03/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/03/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/04/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 11/04/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/08/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/08/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 11/09/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/10/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/10/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/10/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 11/15/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/20/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/20/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 01/25/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/25/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/02/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/24/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/02/1994
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/03/1994
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/09/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/13/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 09/13/1994