Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/04/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/04/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 03/04/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/04/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 03/04/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/04/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/04/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 03/04/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/04/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/04/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/04/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/17/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/17/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/17/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/17/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/17/1993
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 03/17/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/17/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/17/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/17/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/17/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 03/17/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/17/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/17/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/17/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 04/01/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 04/01/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/01/1993
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 04/01/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/01/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/01/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/01/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/07/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/07/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/07/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 04/07/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 04/07/1993
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/21/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/21/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/21/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/21/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/21/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/21/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/21/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/21/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/21/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/28/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 04/28/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/28/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/28/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/28/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/28/1993
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/28/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/28/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/29/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/29/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/10/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/10/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 05/10/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/24/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 05/24/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/24/1993
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 05/24/1993
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/24/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/24/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/24/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/15/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/15/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/15/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 06/15/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/15/1993
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 06/15/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/15/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/15/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/15/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/15/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 06/15/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 06/15/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 06/15/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/15/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/15/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/15/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 06/15/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/15/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/15/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/15/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 06/15/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/15/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/15/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/15/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/15/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/15/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/15/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/15/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/15/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/15/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/15/1993
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 08/06/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/17/1994