Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/30/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/30/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/30/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/30/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/20/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/20/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 04/20/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 04/20/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/20/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/21/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/21/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/21/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/21/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/21/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/21/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/22/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/22/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/22/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/22/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 04/22/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/22/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/22/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/22/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/22/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/22/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/22/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 04/22/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/22/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/22/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 04/22/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/22/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/22/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/22/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/22/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/22/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 04/22/1993
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/22/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/22/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/22/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/22/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/22/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/28/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/28/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/28/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/28/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/28/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/28/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/28/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/28/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/28/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/28/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/28/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/28/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/28/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/29/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/29/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/29/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/29/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 04/29/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/29/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/29/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/29/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/29/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/03/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/03/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/03/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/03/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/03/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/03/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/03/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/10/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/10/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/10/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 05/10/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/10/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/10/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/10/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/10/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/10/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/10/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/10/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/10/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/10/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/10/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/10/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 05/10/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/10/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 05/10/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/11/1993
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-11] 05/11/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/11/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 05/11/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/11/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/11/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/12/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/12/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/12/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/12/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/12/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 05/12/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/18/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/18/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/18/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/18/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/20/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/20/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 05/20/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/20/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/20/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/20/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 05/20/1993
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/25/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/26/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/08/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 09/08/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/08/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 01/25/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 01/25/1994
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/25/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 01/25/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/25/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/01/1994
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/01/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/01/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 02/07/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/08/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/22/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 02/22/1994
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/22/1994
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/22/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/12/1994