Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 03/24/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/24/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/24/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/24/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/24/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/31/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/21/1993
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 04/21/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/28/1993
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 04/28/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/28/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/28/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/29/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/06/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/06/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/06/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/06/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/06/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/06/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 05/11/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98] 05/11/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/11/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/11/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/11/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/13/1993
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/13/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/24/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/24/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/25/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/15/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 10/05/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/22/1993