Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/09/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/12/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 05/12/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 05/12/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/12/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/09/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/09/1993
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/16/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/16/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 06/16/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/18/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/30/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/30/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 07/01/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 07/01/1993
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/13/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 07/13/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/13/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/22/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/22/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/22/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/23/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 09/08/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/08/1993