Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/09/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/11/1993
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/17/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/23/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/23/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/23/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 03/30/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/20/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/20/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/20/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/20/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/20/1993
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/20/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/20/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/11/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/11/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/11/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/19/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/27/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/08/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/08/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/14/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 06/14/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 06/14/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/14/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/14/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 06/14/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 06/14/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/14/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/14/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/14/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/14/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/22/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 06/22/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/22/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/22/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 06/22/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/22/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/22/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/22/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/22/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/22/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/20/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/20/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 07/20/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 07/29/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/29/1993