There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Authorization for Use of United States Armed Forces in Somalia Resolution

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Authorizing the use of United States Armed Forces in Somalia.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/16/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/01/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1820)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/30/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations and Human Rights.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/30/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/16/1993Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E646-647)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/16/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 03/29/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/29/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/29/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/29/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 03/29/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/29/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/29/1993
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 03/29/1993
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/29/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/29/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/30/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/30/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/30/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/30/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/30/1993
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/30/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/30/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/30/1993
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/30/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/30/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 03/30/1993
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/30/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 03/30/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/30/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/30/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/30/1993
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 03/30/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/30/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/30/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/30/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/29/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 04/29/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/16/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa03/30/1993 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations, and Human Rights03/30/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.152.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.152. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/16/1993)

Authorization for Use of United States Armed Forces in Somalia Resolution - Authorizes the President to deploy U.S. armed forces to participate in UNOSOM II (the international United Nations peacekeeping force in Somalia).

Expresses the sense of the Congress that: (1) the President should ensure that the transition from UNITAF (the Unified Task Force established pursuant to United Nations Security Council Resolution 794 which authorized humanitarian relief in Somalia) to UNOSOM II occurs no later than May 1, 1993; (2) the United Nations should foster the establishment of competent local authorities in Somalia and the size of UNOSOM II should be reduced as quickly as the situation will permit; and (3) costs incurred by the United States in connection with UNITAF and UNISOM II are reimbursed to the maximum extent possible by the United Nations and the international community.

Declares that all U.S. armed forces should be withdrawn from Somalia within six months of the date of enactment of this resolution.

Directs the President to report to the Congress at least once every two months until two months after all U.S. armed forces have been withdrawn from Somalia on developments related to Somalia.