Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/05/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/05/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/05/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/27/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/27/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10] 05/27/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/29/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 09/29/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 09/29/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/14/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/14/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/17/1994