Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 04/22/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-98]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1]* 04/22/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/13/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1] 05/13/1993
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/13/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/13/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/13/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/13/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/13/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/13/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/13/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/13/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/13/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/13/1993
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/13/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/09/1993
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-5] 06/09/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/09/1993
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/09/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/09/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/09/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/09/1993
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/09/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 06/09/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/09/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/14/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 07/14/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/14/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/14/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/14/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/14/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/14/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/14/1993
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 07/14/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/14/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/14/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 07/14/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/14/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 07/14/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/14/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/14/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/14/1993
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/27/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/27/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/27/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 07/27/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/27/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 07/30/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/30/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/30/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 07/30/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/30/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/30/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/30/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 08/05/1994
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 08/05/1994
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 08/05/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/05/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/05/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/05/1994
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/05/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/05/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 08/05/1994
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 08/05/1994
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/05/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/05/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 08/05/1994
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 08/05/1994
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 08/05/1994
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 08/05/1994
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 08/05/1994
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 08/05/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 08/05/1994
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/05/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/29/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/29/1994
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/29/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 09/29/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 09/29/1994
Rep. Barca, Peter [D-WI-1] 10/03/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/03/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/05/1994
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/05/1994
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/05/1994
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/05/1994
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/05/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/05/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/05/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/05/1994
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/05/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/06/1994
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/06/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/06/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 10/06/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/1994
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 10/06/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/06/1994
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/06/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/06/1994
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 10/06/1994
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 10/06/1994
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 10/06/1994
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/06/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 10/06/1994
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/06/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 10/06/1994
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 10/06/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 10/06/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/06/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 10/06/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/06/1994
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 10/06/1994
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/06/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 10/06/1994
Rep. Fields, Cleo [D-LA-4] 10/06/1994
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 10/06/1994
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 10/06/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 10/06/1994
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 10/06/1994
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 10/06/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 10/06/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/06/1994
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/06/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/06/1994
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 10/06/1994
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/06/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 10/06/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 10/06/1994
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 10/06/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 10/06/1994
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 10/06/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/06/1994
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 10/06/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 10/06/1994
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/07/1994
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/07/1994
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/07/1994
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/07/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 10/07/1994
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/07/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/07/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/07/1994
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/07/1994
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/07/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 10/07/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/07/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/07/1994
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/07/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/07/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/07/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/07/1994
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/07/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/07/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 10/07/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/07/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/07/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/07/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 10/07/1994
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/07/1994
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/07/1994
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 10/07/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/07/1994
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/07/1994
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/07/1994