Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/08/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/08/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/08/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/08/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/08/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/08/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/08/1993
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/08/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/08/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/08/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/08/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/08/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/10/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/10/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/10/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/10/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/18/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/18/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/18/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/18/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/18/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/18/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/18/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/18/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/18/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15] 07/27/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/27/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 07/27/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/27/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/27/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/27/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/27/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 07/27/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/27/1993
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/27/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/27/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 07/28/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/28/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 07/28/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 07/28/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/28/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/28/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 07/28/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/28/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/28/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/28/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/28/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/28/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 07/29/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/29/1993
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 07/29/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/29/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/29/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/29/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/29/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 07/29/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/29/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/29/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/29/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/30/1993
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/30/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/30/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 07/30/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 07/30/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/30/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/30/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 07/30/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/30/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/30/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/30/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/30/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/30/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/30/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/30/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/30/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/30/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/30/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/30/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/30/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/30/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/30/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 07/30/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/30/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/02/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 08/02/1993
Rep. Hamburg, Dan [D-CA-1] 08/02/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 08/02/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/02/1993
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 08/02/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 08/02/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 08/02/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/1993
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/02/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 08/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 08/05/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 08/05/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/05/1993
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 08/05/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 08/06/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 08/06/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/06/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/06/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/08/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/08/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/08/1993
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/08/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/08/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 09/08/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 10/19/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/19/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 10/19/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/19/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 11/08/1993