There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the week of May 23, 1993, through May 29, 1993, as "International Student Awareness Week".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/28/1993Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (53)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/05/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/05/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/05/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/05/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/05/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/05/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/05/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/05/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/05/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/05/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/05/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/12/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/12/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/12/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/12/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/12/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/12/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/12/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/25/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/25/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/25/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/25/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/25/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/25/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 05/25/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 05/25/1993
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/27/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 08/06/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/23/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service04/28/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.187.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.187. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/1993)

Designates May 23 through 29, 1993, as International Student Awareness Week.