Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 04/28/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/05/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/05/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/05/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/05/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/05/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/05/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/05/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/05/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/05/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/05/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/05/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/05/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/05/1993
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/05/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/05/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/05/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/12/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/12/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/12/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/12/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/12/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/12/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/12/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 05/25/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/25/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/25/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/25/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11] 05/25/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/25/1993
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 05/25/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/25/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/25/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13] 05/25/1993
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 05/25/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/27/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/27/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 08/06/1993
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-24] 08/06/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/23/1993