Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 05/05/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 05/05/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/12/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 05/12/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/12/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/12/1993
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/12/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/12/1993
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/12/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 05/12/1993
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/12/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/12/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/12/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/12/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/12/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 05/12/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/12/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/12/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/12/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/19/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/19/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 05/19/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/19/1993
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 05/19/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/19/1993
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/19/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/19/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/27/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/27/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/27/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 05/27/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/15/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 06/15/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 06/15/1993