Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 05/19/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/19/1993
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 05/19/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/27/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/27/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/27/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/27/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/10/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/10/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/17/1993
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/17/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 06/28/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/28/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/14/1993
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-8] 07/14/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/15/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/15/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/15/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/15/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/15/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 07/20/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/20/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/20/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/20/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/20/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/20/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/20/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/20/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 07/20/1993
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/20/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/20/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/20/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 07/21/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/21/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/22/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 07/22/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/22/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/26/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/26/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/26/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/26/1993
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/27/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/27/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/27/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/27/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/29/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 08/06/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/09/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/09/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/09/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/09/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 09/22/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/22/1993