There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Designating the week of June 7, 1993, as "Equal Pay Act 30th Anniversary Week".


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/26/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
05/26/1993Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/26/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/26/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/10/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/10/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/10/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/10/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/10/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/10/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/10/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 06/10/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/10/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/10/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/10/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/10/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/10/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/15/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/15/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/15/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/02/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/27/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service05/26/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.202.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.202. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/26/1993)

Designates the week of June 7, 1993, as Equal Pay Act 30th Anniversary Week.