Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/26/1993
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-11]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Margolies-Mezvinsky, Marjorie [D-PA-13]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 05/26/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/10/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/10/1993
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/10/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/10/1993
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/10/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/10/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/10/1993
Rep. English, Karan [D-AZ-6] 06/10/1993
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/10/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/10/1993
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/10/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/10/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/10/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/10/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/10/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/15/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/15/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/15/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/02/1993
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/27/1993