Text: H.J.Res.219 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/24/1993)

 
[Congressional Bills 103th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.J. Res. 219 Introduced in House (IH)]

103d CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. J. RES. 219

Designating September 17, 1993, as ``National POW/MIA Recognition Day'' 
  and authorizing display of the National League of Families POW/MIA 
                                 flag.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             June 24, 1993

    Mr. Gilman introduced the following joint resolution; which was 
referred jointly to the Committees on Post Office and Civil Service and 
                           Veterans' Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                            JOINT RESOLUTION


 
Designating September 17, 1993, as ``National POW/MIA Recognition Day'' 
  and authorizing display of the National League of Families POW/MIA 
                                 flag.

Whereas the United States has fought in many wars and thousands of Americans who 
        served in those wars were captured by the enemy or listed as missing in 
        action;
Whereas many American prisoners of war were subjected to brutal and inhumane 
        treatment by their enemy captors in violation of international codes and 
        customs for the treatment of prisoners of war, and many such prisoners 
        of war died from such treatment;
Whereas many of these Americans are still listed as missing and unaccounted for, 
        and the uncertainty surrounding their fates has caused their families to 
        suffer tragic and continuing hardships;
Whereas, in Public Law 101-355, the Federal Government officially recognized and 
        designated the National League of Families POW/MIA flag as the symbol of 
        the Nation's concern and commitment to accounting as fully as possible 
        for Americans still prisoner, missing in action, or unaccounted for in 
        Southeast Asia; and
Whereas the sacrifices of Americans still missing and unaccounted for from all 
        our Nation's wars and their families are deserving of national 
        recognition and support for continued priority efforts to determine the 
        fate of those missing Americans: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. DESIGNATION OF NATIONAL POW/MIA RECOGNITION DAY.

    September 17, 1993, is designated as ``National POW/MIA Recognition 
Day'', and the President is authorized and requested to issue a 
proclamation calling on the people of the United States to observe the 
day with appropriate ceremonies and activities.

SEC. 2. REQUIREMENT TO DISPLAY NATIONAL LEAGUE OF FAMILIES POW/MIA 
              FLAG.

    (a) In General.--The POW/MIA flag shall be displayed--
            (1) at all national cemeteries and the National Vietnam 
        Veterans Memorial on May 31, 1993 (Memorial Day), September 17, 
        1993 (National POW/MIA Recognition Day), and November 11, 1993 
        (Veteran's Day); and
            (2) on, or on the grounds of, the buildings specified in 
        subsection (b) on September 17, 1993;
as the symbol of our Nation's concern and commitment to accounting as 
fully as possible for Americans still prisoner, missing, and 
unaccounted for, thus ending the uncertainty for their families and the 
Nation.
    (b) Buildings.--The buildings specified in this subsection are--
            (1) the White House; and
            (2) the buildings containing the primary offices of the--
                    (A) Secretary of State;
                    (B) Secretary of Defense;
                    (C) Secretary of Veterans Affairs; and
                    (D) Director of the Selective Service Commission.
    (c) POW/MIA Flag.--As used in this section, the term ``POW/MIA 
flag'' means the National League of Families POW/MIA flag recognized 
officially and designated by section 2 of Public Law 101-355.

                                 <all>

Share This