Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/03/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 02/16/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/16/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/16/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/16/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 02/16/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/16/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/16/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/16/1993
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 02/16/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/17/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/18/1993
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-44] 02/23/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/23/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/23/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 02/24/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/25/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/25/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/25/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/01/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 03/01/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/01/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 03/02/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/02/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/03/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/04/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/04/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/09/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/09/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/10/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/10/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/10/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 03/16/1993
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/24/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/24/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/29/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/30/1993
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/27/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/28/1993
Rep. Huffington, Michael [R-CA-22] 09/30/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/10/1994
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4] 02/10/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/11/1994
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/11/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 02/23/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/24/1994
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/16/1994