Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/21/1993
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/21/1993
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/21/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 11/21/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/21/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 11/21/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/21/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/21/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 11/21/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/21/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/21/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/21/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/21/1993
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-4] 11/21/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/21/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/21/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/21/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/21/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 11/21/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/21/1993
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 11/21/1993
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 11/21/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/21/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/21/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 02/09/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/09/1994
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 02/09/1994
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/09/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 02/09/1994
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 02/09/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/09/1994
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 02/09/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/09/1994
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/09/1994
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/09/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 02/09/1994
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/09/1994
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 02/09/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/09/1994
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/09/1994
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/09/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/09/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/09/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 02/09/1994
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/09/1994
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 02/09/1994
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/09/1994
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/09/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/09/1994
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 02/09/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 02/09/1994
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/09/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/09/1994
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 02/09/1994
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/12/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/12/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/12/1994
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/12/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/12/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/12/1994
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/12/1994
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/12/1994
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/12/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/12/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/12/1994
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 05/12/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/12/1994
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/22/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/22/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/22/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/22/1994
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/22/1994
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/22/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/22/1994
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/22/1994
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/21/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/21/1994
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/06/1994
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 10/06/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/06/1994
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/06/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 10/06/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 10/06/1994
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/06/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/06/1994
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 10/06/1994
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/06/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 10/06/1994
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/06/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/06/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 10/06/1994