Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/09/1993
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/09/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/09/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/21/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/21/1993
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/21/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/21/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/21/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/21/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/21/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 09/21/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/21/1993
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/21/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/21/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 09/21/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/21/1993
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/21/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 09/23/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/23/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/23/1993
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 09/23/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/23/1993
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/23/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/23/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/23/1993
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 09/23/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/23/1993
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 09/23/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/23/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/23/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/23/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/23/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/23/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/23/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/23/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/23/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/23/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/23/1993
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/23/1993
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/28/1993
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 09/28/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 09/28/1993
Rep. Reynolds, Mel [D-IL-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/28/1993
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/28/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/28/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/28/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/28/1993
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/28/1993
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/28/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 09/28/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 09/28/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/28/1993
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/28/1993
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/28/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/28/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/28/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/28/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 09/28/1993
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 09/28/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 09/28/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/28/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/28/1993
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/28/1993
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/28/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/28/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/29/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/29/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/29/1993
Rep. Tucker, Walter R., III [D-CA-37] 09/29/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/29/1993
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/29/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/29/1993
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 10/05/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/05/1993
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 10/05/1993
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/05/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/05/1993
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 10/05/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/05/1993
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/05/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/05/1993
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/05/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/05/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/05/1993
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-98] 10/05/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/05/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 10/06/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/06/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/06/1993
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/07/1993
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 10/07/1993
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/07/1993
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/07/1993
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/07/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/07/1993
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/07/1993
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/02/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/02/1993
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 11/02/1993
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 11/02/1993
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 11/02/1993
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/02/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/08/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/08/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/22/1993