There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States prohibiting Federal laws and rules that impose liability for conduct occurring before the date of enactment or issuance.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/08/1993Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
12/09/1993Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic and Commercial Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/08/1993Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/08/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6392)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/08/1993Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (119)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Baker, Bill [R-CA-10]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/08/1993
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/08/1993
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/13/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/13/1993
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/13/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 09/13/1993
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/13/1993
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 09/13/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/13/1993
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/13/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/13/1993
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/13/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/13/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/13/1993
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/15/1993
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/21/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/23/1993
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 09/23/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 09/23/1993
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/23/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 09/23/1993
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/28/1993
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/15/1993
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/09/1994
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/30/1994
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/08/1993 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Economic and Commercial Law12/09/1993 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.256.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.256. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/08/1993)

Constitutional Amendment - Declares that no person, under any law enacted by the Congress or any rule issued by a Federal entity, shall be liable for conduct occurring, or with respect to income accruing, before the date of enactment of the law or issuance of the rule.