Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 09/08/1993
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 09/14/1993
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/14/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/14/1993
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 09/22/1993
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 09/29/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/06/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 10/06/1993
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/06/1993
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 10/06/1993
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/06/1993
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/06/1993
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 10/06/1993
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 10/06/1993
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 10/12/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27] 10/12/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/12/1993
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/12/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 10/12/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/12/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 10/12/1993
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 10/12/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 11/09/1993
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 11/09/1993
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 11/09/1993
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/09/1993
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 11/09/1993
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 11/09/1993
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/09/1993
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/09/1993
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/09/1993
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/09/1993
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/09/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 11/15/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/15/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 11/15/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 11/15/1993
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 11/15/1993
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 11/15/1993
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-46] 11/15/1993
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/15/1993
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/15/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/15/1993
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/15/1993
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/15/1993
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 11/15/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 11/15/1993
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/15/1993
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/15/1993
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/15/1993
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/15/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/15/1993
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/15/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98] 11/15/1993
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 11/15/1993
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/15/1993
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/15/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3] 11/15/1993
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 11/15/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20] 11/15/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/15/1993
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/15/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/15/1993
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/15/1993
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/15/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 11/15/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 11/16/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/16/1993
Rep. Coppersmith, Sam [D-AZ-1] 11/16/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8] 11/16/1993
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/16/1993
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 11/16/1993
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 11/16/1993
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/16/1993
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 11/16/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/16/1993
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 11/16/1993
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/16/1993
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/17/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 11/17/1993
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/17/1993
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/17/1993
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/17/1993
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/17/1993
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 11/17/1993
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/17/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/17/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 11/17/1993
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-5] 11/17/1993
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 11/17/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/17/1993
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/19/1993
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/19/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 11/19/1993
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/19/1993
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/19/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/19/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 11/19/1993
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/19/1993
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 11/19/1993
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/19/1993
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/23/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/23/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/23/1993
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/23/1993
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/23/1993
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/23/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/23/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/23/1993
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 11/23/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 11/23/1993
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/23/1993
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-98] 11/23/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/23/1993
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 11/23/1993
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 11/23/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 11/23/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/23/1993
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 11/23/1993
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-5] 11/23/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/23/1993
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/23/1993
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 11/23/1993
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 11/23/1993
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/23/1993
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/23/1993
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 11/23/1993
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/23/1993