Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Barlow, Tom [D-KY-1]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-15]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 11/03/1993
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Klein, Herbert C. [D-NJ-8]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR-1]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-27]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-20]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-98]* 11/03/1993
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/03/1994
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/03/1994
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/03/1994
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/03/1994
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/03/1994
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-3] 03/03/1994
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/03/1994
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/03/1994
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/03/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/03/1994
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/03/1994
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-15] 04/12/1994
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/12/1994
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 04/12/1994
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/12/1994
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 04/12/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 04/12/1994
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-13] 04/12/1994
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/12/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/12/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/12/1994
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 04/12/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 04/12/1994
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/12/1994
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-15] 04/12/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/12/1994
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/12/1994
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/12/1994
Rep. Tejeda, Frank [D-TX-28] 04/12/1994
Rep. Torkildsen, Peter G. [R-MA-6] 04/12/1994
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/12/1994
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/12/1994
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/20/1994
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/20/1994
Rep. Byrne, Leslie L. [D-VA-11] 05/20/1994
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/20/1994
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/20/1994
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-16] 05/20/1994
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/20/1994
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/20/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/20/1994
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/20/1994
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/20/1994
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/20/1994
Rep. Johnson, Don [D-GA-10] 05/20/1994
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/20/1994
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/20/1994
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/20/1994
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-19] 05/20/1994
Rep. Mann, David [D-OH-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/1994
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/20/1994
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/20/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/20/1994
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/20/1994
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/20/1994
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/20/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/20/1994
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/20/1994
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/20/1994
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/20/1994
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/20/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/20/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/20/1994
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/20/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/20/1994
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/20/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/26/1994
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/26/1994
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 05/26/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/26/1994