Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 11/04/1993
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 03/09/1994
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/09/1994
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Blute, Peter I. [R-MA-3] 03/09/1994
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/09/1994
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/09/1994
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/09/1994
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/09/1994
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/09/1994
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/09/1994
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/09/1994
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/09/1994
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/09/1994
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/09/1994
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/1994
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/09/1994
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/19/1994
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/19/1994
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/19/1994
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/19/1994
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/19/1994
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/19/1994
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/19/1994
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/19/1994
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/19/1994
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-16] 05/19/1994
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/19/1994
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/19/1994
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/24/1994
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/24/1994
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/24/1994
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/24/1994
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/24/1994
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/24/1994
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/24/1994
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/24/1994
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/24/1994
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/24/1994
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/24/1994
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/24/1994
Rep. Grams, Rod [R-MN-6] 06/24/1994
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-19] 07/29/1994
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/29/1994
Rep. Levy, David A. [R-NY-4] 07/29/1994
Rep. Fingerhut, Eric D. [D-OH-19] 07/29/1994
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/29/1994
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/29/1994
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/29/1994
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/29/1994
Rep. Kreidler, Mike [D-WA-9] 07/29/1994
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 07/29/1994
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/29/1994
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-11] 07/29/1994
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/29/1994
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/29/1994
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 07/29/1994
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/29/1994
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/29/1994
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/29/1994
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/29/1994
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/29/1994
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/29/1994